IL SB1780 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Rights Act. Provides that if exigent circumstances arise, the park owner is responsible for providing a water supply to each household following a 5-day period of no water.
Title
MOBILE HOMES-WATER SUPPLY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0227 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |