IL SB1761 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Prohibits a State agency from entering into a contract subject to the Code with a business that boycotts Israel. Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires each of the 5 State-funded retirement systems (or the Illinois State Board of Investment where applicable) to make its best efforts to identify all companies that boycott Israel in which it has direct or indirect holdings and, under certain circumstances, to divest itself of holdings in those companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE-PROHIBITED TRANSACTIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0128
2015-07-23SenateEffective Date July 23, 2015
2015-07-23SenateGovernor Approved
2015-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2015-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2015-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2015-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2015-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2015-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2015-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2015-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2015-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2015-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2015-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2015-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2015-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
2015-05-08HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
2015-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2015-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2015-05-04HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2015-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2015-04-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2015-04-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2015-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2015-04-23HouseArrived in House
2015-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2015-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-003
2015-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2015-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2015-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Silverstein
2015-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2015-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-001
2015-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2015-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2015-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2015-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2015-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2015-03-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy
2015-03-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2015-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015
2015-03-19SenateSecond Reading
2015-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood
2015-03-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015
2015-03-18SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-001
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2015-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2015-03-11SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-02-20SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-20SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050050-36.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4051-110.16New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback