IL SB1756 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Provides that a person, either directly or indirectly by an agent or employee, or by a vending machine owned by the person or located in the person's establishment, may not sell, offer for sale, give, or furnish any alternative nicotine product, or any cartridge or component of an alternative nicotine product, to a person under 18 years of age. Provides that before selling, offering for sale, giving, or furnishing an alternative nicotine product, or any cartridge or component of an alternative nicotine product, to another person, the person selling, offering for sale, giving, or furnishing the alternative nicotine product shall verify that the person is at least 18 years of age by: (1) examining from any person that appears to be under 27 years of age a government-issued photographic identification that establishes the person is at least 18 years of age or (2) for sales made though the Internet or other remote sales methods, performing an age verification through an independent, third-party age verification service that compares information available from public records to the personal information entered by the person during the ordering process that establishes the person is 18 years of age or older. Establishes penalties.
Title
ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE-MINOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0350 |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-05-28 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2013-05-28 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 675 | 1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 675 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |