IL SB1751 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that after a community mental health or developmental services agency's license has been revoked, it shall continue providing for the health, safety, and welfare of the individuals it was serving by ensuring residents have been fully informed of their rights and options within time frames to be specified in rule and by a specified private, not-for-profit corporation directed by the Governor to administer the State plan to protect and advocate for the rights of persons with developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 010-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2101356Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback