IL SB1746 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to issuing bonds not to exceed a certain amount for the purpose of creating, recreating, or increasing a working cash fund, adds to that amount 85% of the most recent amount of funding received by the school district under the evidence-based funding formula. Provides that moneys in the working cash fund may be used by a school board for any and all school purposes and may be transferred in whole or in part to the general funds or both of the school district and disbursed in anticipation of funding received by the school district under the evidence-based funding formula. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-WORKING CASH FUND
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0416 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2019 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-044-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Belt |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 20-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 20-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |