IL SB1740 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates a reduction for improvements to foreclosed property. Provides that the assessed value of those improvements shall be reduced 10% of the equalized assessed value of the improvements on June 30, 2012. Provides that the reduction shall be for a period of 5 years, and is subject to certain conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ASSESSMENT FREEZE PROG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1143 |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 4 - December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 4 |
2014-11-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-11-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2014-11-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2014-11-19 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-11-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-06 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2014-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2014-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-01 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-04-10 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Trotter |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |