IL SB1738 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Judicial Campaign Reform Act. Contains only a short title.
Title
JUDICIAL CAMPAIGN REFORM-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-03 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Election Law; /3-14-2011 - Postponed |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1738&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1738.htm |