IL SB1735 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall certify United States Department of Labor apprenticeship programs which have joint labor management boards regulated under the federal Labor Management Relations Act as able to teach, train, and test their own members for any quality assurance and quality control certifications required by the Department. Provides that the Department shall make all course curricula, teaching aides, syllabi, and tests for the instructors of programs available without charge. Provides that the Department shall bear the cost of administering required testing, and that the Department or any third party it uses to administer the testing shall provide testers upon 10 days notice. Provides that if testers are not provided by the Department or third party, the apprenticeship program may provide its own testers. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT:TRAINING-CERTIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Righter |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Jacobs |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 009-001-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2011 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Held in Labor |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2705 | 49.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |