IL SB1733 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Increases the maximum liability of a renter of a vehicle for damages resulting from loss due to theft of the vehicle from $2,000 to the actual and reasonable costs incurred up to the fair market value of the vehicle immediately before the loss occurred, as calculated by a commonly and commercially accepted method to establish a fair market value. Provides that a renter who loses or otherwise fails to secure the keys of a rented motor vehicle shall be liable for any damage to the vehicle as a result of the failure or, if the vehicle is not returned to the person, its fair market value immediately before the loss occurred.
Title
VEH CD-RENTAL CAR INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-305.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1733&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1733.htm |