IL SB1724 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires managed care organizations (MCOs) to participate in the Non-Emergency Transportation Services Prior Approval Program (NETSPAP) established under the Code beginning 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Requires each MCO to submit through NETSPAP for adjudication every unpaid non-emergency transportation claim incurred since January 1, 2012; and requires a NETSPAP contractor to adjudicate such claims without regard to any deadlines for submission or processing that are otherwise applicable. Provides that all non-emergency ambulance service providers seeking reimbursement for prior claims must submit documentation of the transport no later than 150 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that upon receipt of approval from the NETSPAP contractor, each MCO shall process and pay all approved claims within 30 days, without requiring any further action by the non-emergency transportation services provider; and that any denial of reimbursement by the NETSPAP contractor may be appealed. Provides that any costs incurred in connection with the review of claims by the NETSPAP contractor shall be the sole responsibility of the MCO. Provides that MCOs shall not unreasonably refuse to contract with ground ambulance services providers and medi-car services providers, shall not unreasonably restrict access to and the availability of ground ambulance services and medi-car services, and shall ensure that recipients of benefits provided under the Department of Healthcare and Family Services' programs shall not be liable for ground ambulance services and medi-car services expenses consistent with federal law and specified provisions of the Illinois Insurance Code and the Illinois Administrative Code. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-MANAGED CARE-AMBULNCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1724&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1724.htm |