IL SB1721 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Provides that before dispensing a hearing aid by mail or over the Internet to a resident of this State, an organization shall inform (i) the parent or guardian of a person age 17 or younger that he or she must obtain a prescription issued by a licensed audiologist or licensed physician that meets specified requirements or (ii) a person age 18 or older that he or she must obtain a prescription issued by a hearing instrument professional that meets specified requirements. Makes changes to provisions concerning hearing aids dispensed by prescription to persons age 17 or younger and prescription hearing aids for persons age 18 or older. Changes references from "hearing instrument dispenser" to "hearing instrument professional". Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
HEARING INSTRUMENT ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0495 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 11, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-04-26 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2023-04-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fine |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 012-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-703 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 50 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 50 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 50 | 9.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |