IL SB1721 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions about delinquent property, provides that a county may take steps necessary (currently, shall take all steps necessary) to acquire title to the property and may manage and operate the property, including, but not limited to, mowing of grass, removal of nuisance greenery, removal of garbage, waste, debris or other materials, or the demolition, repair, or remediation of unsafe structures. Provides costs to be distributed to taxing districts, including operation and maintenance costs and all costs associated with county staff and overhead used to perform the duties of the trustees. Reduces the maximum penalty bids for the annual tax sale from 18% to 12%. In provisions about redemption of property, limits the assessments of penalties from every 6 months to 12 months. Makes conforming changes. Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Modifies the requirements to have a circuit court declare property abandoned.
Title
PROP TAX-DELINQUENT PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0363 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-004-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 006-004-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Revenue |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-31-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |