IL SB1721 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Family Leave Insurance Act. Provides that an employee may take up to 12 weeks of family leave within any 24-month period for the purpose of providing care for the birth of a child, adoption of a child or placement of a foster child, or serious health condition of a family member. Establishes terms and conditions for taking leave. Authorizes compensation for the family leave to be paid from the State Benefits Fund, a special fund created in the State treasury. Prohibits simultaneous receipt of benefits under the Family Leave Insurance Act, the Unemployment Insurance Act, and the Workers' Compensation Act. Imposes a charge upon certain wages for the payment of benefits. Provides for administration by the Department of Employment Security. Amends the State Finance Act to add the State Benefits Fund to the list of special funds in the State treasury. Creates civil penalties for certain violations. Provides that a violation with intent to defraud the Department is a Class C misdemeanor. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAMILY LEAVE INSURANCE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback