IL SB1704 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Eliminates convictions of prostitution and felony prostitution under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance from a provision permitting a motion to vacate the conviction. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-MOTION TO VACATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255116-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback