IL SB1692 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code to make changes to provisions concerning student athletes and concussions and head injuries. Provides that a school may appoint a physician assistant to serve on its concussion oversight team. With respect to a student who has been removed from practice or competition practicing or competing again, provides for evaluation by an advanced practice nurse working under the supervision of a physician or by a physician assistant working under the supervision of a physician; makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ATHLETE CONCUSSIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
2017-05-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Education
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-80Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback