IL SB1688 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to consider certain mitigating factors and evidence of rehabilitation for certain applicants of licenses, certificates, and registrations. Requires the Department, upon denial of a license, certificate, or registration, to provide the applicant certain information concerning the denial. Provides that no application for licensure or registration shall be denied by reason of a finding of lack of good moral character when the finding is based solely upon the fact that the applicant has one or more previous convictions. Provides that the Department shall not require applicants to report certain criminal history information and the Department shall not consider the information. Provides that on May 1 of each year, the Department shall prepare, publicly announce, and publish certain statistical information. Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Includes applications for license, certification, and registration that must contain specific language which states that the applicant is not obligated to disclose sealed or expunged records of conviction or arrest and entities authorized to grant professional licenses, certifications, and registrations that may not ask if an applicant has had records expunged or sealed. Provides that certain sealed or impounded felony records shall not be disseminated in connection with an application for a professional or business license, except specified health care worker licenses. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR-CRIMINAL HISTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Raoul
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-001-000
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-001
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021052105-130Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-131New CodeSee Bill Text
2021052105-135Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-205Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-207Amended CodeCitation Text
20210560.3Amended CodeCitation Text
20263012Amended CodeCitation Text
20263013Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback