IL SB1687 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Motor Vehicle Franchise Act. Provides additional findings that the regulation of motor vehicle manufacturers creates a system for servicing vehicles and complying with warranties. Provides that paying manufacturer's and distributor's fees under the Illinois Vehicle Code constitutes agreement with the terms of the Motor Vehicle Franchise Act. Limits the ability of a manufacturer to penalize a dealer if a customer resells or exports a vehicle. Limits a manufacturer from requiring dealer improvements or requiring that dealers use specific vendors for improvements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOTOR VEH FRANCHISE RIGHTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 006-004-000
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-05-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-19HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-19HouseArrived in House
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2017
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sandoval
2017-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Transportation
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8157101.1Amended CodeCitation Text
8157101.5New CodeSee Bill Text
81571012Amended CodeCitation Text
8157102Amended CodeCitation Text
8157104Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback