IL SB1680 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Hearing: May 30 @ 9:00 am in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that, in the case of funds received by a county from the Department of Transportation to be apportioned to road districts for the construction of bridges, a road district shall, in order to be eligible for the expenditure of the apportioned funds, levy taxes for road and bridge purposes under a provision in the Motor Fuel Tax Law (rather than levy taxes under certain provisions of the Illinois Highway Code). Removes a provision allowing a road district that is otherwise ineligible to receive apportioned funds due to a property tax limitation to become eligible if certain conditions are met. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HWY CD-ROAD DISTRICT TAX LEVY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-18HouseArrived in House
2017-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval
2017-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60556-901Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback