IL SB1670 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gubernatorial Boards and Commissions Act. Provides that the Governor's Office of Boards and Commissions database shall include an application data field where an applicant may optionally disclose his or her sexual orientation for reporting purposes in applying for appointment to a board or commission. Provides that certain demographic composition information required to be reported to the General Assembly by the Governor shall also include the voluntarily and publicly disclosed sexual orientation of appointees and applicants for appointment by the Governor. Defines "sexual orientation".
Title
BD & COMM DEMOGRAPHIC INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0234 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-012-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-004-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 008-002-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 50 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 50 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 50 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |