IL SB1667 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that every owner of a watercraft for which no certificate of title has been issued shall make application to the Secretary of State for a certificate of title. Provides that the Secretary shall undertake all responsibilities related to the issuance and transfer of certificates of title, including rulemaking authority, for watercraft under the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of the Boat Registration and Safety Act, the Secretary of State shall issue all certificates of title and undertake all responsibilities related to the issuance and transfer of certificates of title, including rulemaking authority, for watercraft under that Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall not issue certificates of title or perform the responsibilities related to issuance or transfer of certificates of title.
Title
BOAT CERTIFICATES OF TITLE-SOS
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 45 | 3A-0.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-101.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1667&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1667.htm |