IL SB1667 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Residential Mortgage License Act of 1987. Provides that persons exempt from licensure as a federally chartered savings bank registered with the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry may apply for an exempt company registration for the purpose of sponsoring one or more individuals subject to the mortgage loan originator licensing requirements of the Act. Establishes requirements for exempt company registration and denial, suspension, or revocation of the registration. Effective immediately.
Title
MORTGAGE-LICENSE EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0492 |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date August 16, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-004-002 |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 635 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |