IL SB1666 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings and the purpose of the Act. Provides that beginning on the effective date of the Act, any food offered for retail sale in this State is misbranded if it is entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering and that fact is not disclosed in a certain manner. Provides that the Act shall not be construed to require either the listing or identification of any ingredient or ingredients that were genetically engineered, nor that the term "genetically engineered" be placed immediately preceding any common name or primary product descriptor of a food. Provides that until the effective date of the Act, any processed food that would be subject to the provision concerning the labeling of genetically engineered foods solely because it includes one or more materials produced by genetic engineering is not misbranded provided that the engineered materials in the aggregate do not account for more than a certain amount of the total weight of the processed food. Sets forth provisions concerning applicability and the right of action for violations, damages, and attorneys' fees. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules necessary to implement the Act. Contains a severability provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GENETICALLY ENGINEERED FOOD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-13SenateSession Sine Die
2014-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2014-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-04-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-03-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
2014-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
2014-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2014-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2014-03-21SenateRe-assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
2014-03-21SenateSponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado
2014-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2014-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2014-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2014-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2014-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2014-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2014-02-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2014-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2013-11-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
2013-10-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2013-09-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2013-07-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2013-07-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2013-07-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2013-06-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2013-05-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2013-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2013-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2013-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2013-03-12SenateTo Subcommittee on Food Labeling
2013-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2013-02-28SenateRe-assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
2013-02-28SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2013-02-27SenateAssigned to Environment
2013-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2013-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback