IL SB1663 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning making rules and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CAREER & WORKFORCE TRANSITION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-27HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 009-000-000
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1102059.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback