IL SB1659 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Communicable Disease Prevention Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt a rule requiring students, upon entering the 6th grade of any public, private, or parochial school, to receive a human papillomavirus (HPV) vaccination. Provides that the Department shall adopt the rule in time to allow students to receive the vaccination before the start of the school year beginning in 2022. Effective January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-HPV VACCINATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateTabled By Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4103152fNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback