IL SB1645 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Water Shutoff Restoration Act. Provides that public water supply authorities must use their best efforts to restore full water service to occupied residences that are without water service due to nonpayment unless those occupied residences have improper cross-connections that would risk public safety. Provides that for occupied residences with improper cross-connections, public water supply authorities must use their best efforts to rectify the cross-connection and restore full water service. Provides that public water supply authorities must identify occupied residences without full water service within their service areas and report their findings to the Illinois Commerce Commission within 8 weeks after the effective date of this Act and every month thereafter. Provides that these reports must detail what efforts have been made to provide full water service to occupied residences that still do not have full water service. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
WATER SHUTOFF RESTORATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1645&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1645.htm |