IL SB1632 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act. Removes a provision requiring a person to pass an examination as authorized by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to be qualified to be licensed as a licensed social worker. Makes corresponding changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOCIAL WORKER-EXAMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
2021-05-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-05HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
2021-03-17SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2252011Amended CodeCitation Text
225205Amended CodeCitation Text
225208Amended CodeCitation Text
225209AAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback