IL SB1630 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Automatic Contract Renewal Act. Removes school districts from the list of entities excluded from the definition of the term "parties". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTO CONTRACT RENEW SCHOOLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0412
2019-08-16SenateEffective Date August 16, 2019
2019-08-16SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-08HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-05-08HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000
2019-04-25HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Education; 014-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8156015Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback