IL SB1629 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a municipality with a population of more than 100,000 but less than 1,000,000 may enter into an intergovernmental agreement with the county in which the municipality is situated to provide that the county collector shall include with the property tax bill for each parcel of property within the municipality an invoice for municipal service charges for the disposal of garbage, refuse, or ashes. Provides that municipality shall furnish the invoices to the county collector not less than 15 days before the tax bill is mailed to the property owner and may reimburse the county collector for any necessary expenses associated with mailing the invoices as provided in the agreement.
Title
PROP TX-GARBAGE INVOICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-27 | House | Remains in Cities & Villages Committee |
2015-05-27 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Cities & Villages Committee; 002-005-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Cities & Villages Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-25 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; LaHood |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 20-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 20-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |