IL SB1628 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
COMMUNITY CARE-MEDICAID ENROLL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-002-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 094-017-001 |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Aging Committee; 012-001-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Aging Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Aging Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Aging Committee |
2018-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-012-001 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Martinez |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |