IL SB1621 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Violence Prevention Act. Tasks health care providers with reporting any incident of verbal aggression or physical assault of a health care worker employed by the health care provider in the health care provider's emergency department to the Department of Public Health. Requires the Department to track the information reported to assess each health care provider's progress in systemically limiting the verbal aggression toward and physical assault of health care workers. Requires health care providers to post notice regarding verbal aggression and physical assault of health care workers in each emergency department of the health care provider. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH CARE VIOLENCE-ASSAULT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 160 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1621&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1621.htm |