IL SB1609 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private Business and Vocational Schools Act of 2012, the Private College Act, and the Academic Degree Act. Defines "religious institution" in these Acts. Provides that any religious institution (instead of any institution devoted entirely to the teaching of religion or theology) shall not be considered to be a private business and vocational school; makes related changes. Provides that no religious institution shall be subject to the educational requirements, standards, or demands contained in the Private College Act or the Academic Degree Act or in those Acts' administrative rules.
Title
HIGHR ED-RELIGIOUS INSTITUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 426 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 426 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 426 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 1005 | 1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 1010 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1609&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1609.htm |