IL SB1606 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Department of Innovation and Technology Act to codify the changes made in Executive Order 2016-001. Creates the Department of Innovation and Technology. Abolishes the Information Technology Office (also known as the Office of the Chief Information Officer) within the Office of the Governor and transfers its functions, personnel, and property to Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the transfer of information technology functions, including related personnel and property, from specified State agencies, boards, and commissions to the Department of Innovation and Technology. Provides for the powers and responsibilities of the Department of Innovation and Technology, including specified programs and initiatives. Provides for the appointment of the Secretary and Assistant Secretary of Innovation and Technology by the Governor, with the advice and consent of the Senate. Provides that the Secretary shall serve as the Chief Information Officer of the State. Amends the Open Meetings Act, the Gubernatorial Boards and Commissions Act, the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the State Fire Marshal Act, the Illinois Century Network Act, the State Finance Act, the Grant Information Collection Act, the Illinois Pension Code, the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act, the Public Aid Code, the Methamphetamine Precursor Tracking Act, the Workers' Compensation Act, and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act to make conforming changes. Repeals Sections in the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEPT-INNOVATION AND TECHNOLOGY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Nybo
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - State Government
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government;
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-001-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2029052.5Amended CodeCitation Text
20392115Amended CodeCitation Text
20392120Amended CodeCitation Text
2040535.3Amended CodeCitation Text
20405405-10Amended CodeCitation Text
20405405-20Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-250Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-255Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-260Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-265Repealed CodeCitation Text
20405405-270Amended CodeCitation Text
20405405-410Amended CodeCitation Text
2040567.18Amended CodeCitation Text
20512Amended CodeCitation Text
2052.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2053Amended CodeCitation Text
2054Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-221New CodeSee Bill Text
2055-357New CodeSee Bill Text
2055-605Amended CodeCitation Text
20605605-1007Amended CodeCitation Text
20605605-680Amended CodeCitation Text
21551202Amended CodeCitation Text
21551206Amended CodeCitation Text
2155408Amended CodeCitation Text
2155408.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2257321-110Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.55Amended CodeCitation Text
301056p-1Amended CodeCitation Text
301056p-2Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-34Amended CodeCitation Text
301058.16aAmended CodeCitation Text
301058.16bAmended CodeCitation Text
3070710Amended CodeCitation Text
305512-10.10Amended CodeCitation Text
4051-160Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-110Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-106Amended CodeCitation Text
72064920Amended CodeCitation Text
82030517Amended CodeCitation Text
82031017Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback