IL SB1599 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act in relation to the dissemination of criminal record information. In provisions making it an unlawful practice for a person or entity that publishes for profit a person's criminal record information to fail to correct an error in the individual's criminal record information under specified circumstances, provides that those provisions also apply to other dissemination of the information and to publication in a criminal history report. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to restrict or limit the ability of an aggrieved party to proceed through established federal or State remedies or other alternative methods of redress for similar offenses.
Title
CONSUMER FRAUD-CRIMINAL RECORD
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0431 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sims |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sims |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-003-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2QQQ | Amended Code | Citation Text |