IL SB1599 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that taxpayers (other than estates, trusts, partnerships, Subchapter S corporations, and farmers) are required to pay estimated tax if the amount payable can reasonably be expected to be more than $1,000 (currently, $500). Provides that corporations are required to pay estimated tax if the amount payable can reasonably be expected to be more than $400 (which is the same as current law).
Title
INC TX-ESTIMATED TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (RV) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |