IL SB1596 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning medical assistance for the treatment of alcohol dependence or opioid dependence, provides that on or after July 1, 2017 such coverage may be subject to utilization controls or prior authorization mandates consistent with the most current edition of the American Society of Addiction Medicine's National Practice Guideline for the Use of Medications in the Treatment of Addiction Involving Opioid Use, as now or hereafter revised, or any successor publication (rather than on or after July 1, 2015 such coverage shall not be subject to any (1) utilization control, other than those established under the American Society of Addiction Medicine patient placement criteria, (2) prior authorization mandate, or (3) lifetime restriction limit mandate). Provides that on or after July 1, 2017, opioid antagonists prescribed for the treatment of an opioid overdose may be subject to (A) utilization controls or (B) prior authorization mandates consistent with the most current edition of the American Society of Addiction Medicine's National Practice Guideline for the Use of Medications in the Treatment of Addiction Involving Opioid Use, as now or hereafter revised, or any successor publication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-UTILIZATION CONTROLS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-29SenateReported Back To Human Services; 002-001-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback