IL SB1595 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Pregnancy Help Center Referral Act. Provides that a person may not perform an abortion unless the person first provides the pregnant woman with the name, address, and telephone number of an organization that: (1) is within reasonable proximity of the abortion facility where the abortion will be performed; (2) has as one of its principal missions to provide education, counseling, and other assistance to help a pregnant mother maintain her relationship with and care for her unborn child; and (3) does not perform abortions, is not affiliated with any physician or entity that performs abortions, and does not refer pregnant mothers for abortions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREGNANCY HELP CENTER-REFERRAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateTo Subcommittee on Civil Rights
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback