IL SB1592 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Elections Code. Allows counties to create a board of election commissioners within the office of the county clerk. Sets forth procedures for adoption, compensation, effect, transfer of records, procurement of supplies, references, personnel, and legal representation. Creates a county director of elections. Requires certain meetings of the board. Requires retention of records and audits. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-BOARD OF ELEC COMM
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Harmon |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-001-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 6-19.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6B-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 6B heading | New Code | See Bill Text |