IL SB1588 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Adds to the definition of "brownfield site photovoltaic project", photovoltaics that meet the criteria that the project is interconnected to an electric utility, a municipal utility, a public utility as defined in the Public Utilities Act, or an electric cooperative as defined in the Public Utilities Act and is located on any part of the site, and within the property boundaries, of a coal-fueled electric generating plant in this State that was retired as of January 1, 2023, or that the generating plant owner commits to retire prior to the commercial operation date of the project. In provisions concerning renewable energy credits from new projects in the long-term renewable resources procurement plan, the Agency shall procure 55% from photovoltaic projects where at least 44% (rather than 47%) are from utility-scale solar projects and at least 3% are from projects that meet specified criteria. Effective immediately.
Title
IL POWER AG-BROWNFIELD SITE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |