IL SB1588 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In a provision that authorizes a brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to sell on the licensed premises beer manufactured by the brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to non-licensees, provides that the authorization shall not permit the sale of beer manufactured on the licensed premises (i) bearing the name of another brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer or (ii) where the brand, trade name, and intellectual property rights to the beer are not owned or controlled by the manufacturing brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer. Makes similar changes to provisions concerning craft distillers. Provides that a self-distribution exemption granted to a class 1 brewer shall not permit the self-distribution of beer manufactured on the licensed premises bearing the name of another manufacturer of beer not owned or under the control of the class 1 brewer. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-BREWERS/CRAFT DISTILLER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Executive; 012-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback