IL SB1584 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. For school years beginning on or after July 1, 2019, increases to 120 days (instead of 100 days) the amount of days a service retirement pensioner who is re-employed as a teacher may work without having his or her pension cancelled. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI TCH-RETURN TO WORK
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0340 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-016-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |