IL SB1578 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Seizure and Forfeiture Reporting Act. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall establish and maintain on its official website a searchable public database that includes specified information about property seized and forfeited under State law and under any agreement with the federal government. Provides that every law enforcement agency that seizes property subject to reporting under the Act shall report the specified information required under the Act on a monthly basis. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority may recoup its costs under the Act by charging a fee to law enforcement agencies required to file a report. Provides that the Act applies to provisions of law that authorizes a law enforcement agency to seize property alleged to have been used in or derived from the commission of a criminal offense. Creates the Asset Forfeiture Proceeds Disbursement Law. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall award grants under the procedures of the Act for the disbursement of monies collected in the Asset Forfeiture Proceeds Fund. Amends various Acts concerning criminal forfeiture to make conforming changes. Changes most forfeiture distributions from law enforcement agencies to the Asset Forfeiture Proceeds Fund. Makes changes to the procedures and distribution of contraband proceeds to various governmental units and agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL FORFEITURE PROCEDURES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-002
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
4106203.23Amended CodeCitation Text
415544.1Amended CodeCitation Text
51068105-55Amended CodeCitation Text
51551-215Amended CodeCitation Text
52051.25Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-10.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-5Amended CodeCitation Text
720529B-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720529B-1.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-1.5New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-10New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-11New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-12New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-13New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-14New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-15New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-16New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-17New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-18New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-19New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-2New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-20New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-21New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-22New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-3New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-4New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-5New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-6New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-7New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-8New CodeSee Bill Text
720529B-9New CodeSee Bill Text
720533G-6Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.2New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.3New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.4New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-1.6New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-1aRepealed CodeCitation Text
720536-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-2.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720536-3.1New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-3.2New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-5Repealed CodeCitation Text
720536-6New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-7New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-8New CodeSee Bill Text
720536-9New CodeSee Bill Text
720547-15Amended CodeCitation Text
72055012Amended CodeCitation Text
720570505Amended CodeCitation Text
72064685Amended CodeCitation Text
72515010Amended CodeCitation Text
72515014Repealed CodeCitation Text
72515015New CodeSee Bill Text
72515016New CodeSee Bill Text
72515017New CodeSee Bill Text
72515018New CodeSee Bill Text
72515019New CodeSee Bill Text
7251502Amended CodeCitation Text
72515020New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.1New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.3New CodeSee Bill Text
7251503.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7251504Repealed CodeCitation Text
7251505Amended CodeCitation Text
7251505.1New CodeSee Bill Text
7251505.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7251506Repealed CodeCitation Text
7251507Repealed CodeCitation Text
7251508Amended CodeCitation Text
7251509Amended CodeCitation Text
7251509.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7251755Amended CodeCitation Text
7251756.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7255124B-1030Repealed CodeCitation Text
7255124B-1040Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-195New CodeSee Bill Text
7255124B-305Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-420Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-505Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-605Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-715Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-825Amended CodeCitation Text
7255124B-935Amended CodeCitation Text
74014740Amended CodeCitation Text
815511Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback