IL SB1566 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the grounds accorded weight in favor of withholding or minimizing a sentence of imprisonment include that the defendant is pregnant or is the parent of a child or infant whose well-being will be negatively affected by the parent's absence. Provides that circumstances to be considered in assessing this factor in mitigation include: (1) the likelihood that the child will be adjudged a dependent minor and declared a ward of the court under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987; and (2) the best interest of the child.
Title
CD CORR-MITIGATION-CHILD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0211 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |