IL SB1564 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Telephone System Act. Provides that a monthly surcharge of $0.87 charged by telecommunications carriers shall not apply to local, municipal, or State police or fire departments who use cell phones owned by that department for communication related to the response of emergencies.
Title
TELE SURCHARGE-POLICE & FIRE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 750 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |