IL SB1561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Solid Waste Planning and Recycling Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to permit a county with a population of less than 2,000,000 residents the power to regulate the operations of pollution control facilities or recycling centers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLLUTION CONTROL-COUNTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-019-000
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 016-001-000
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017
2017-03-02SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415159.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback