IL SB1556 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0450
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds to the definition of "junk vehicle" and "remittance agent". Provides that a certificate of title issued by the Secretary of State shall contain the names and fax numbers or electronic addresses of any lienholders (rather than only the names of the lienholders) and the certificate's expiration date. Provides that an expiration date of 2 calendar years after the end of term of the lien shall be included in each certificate of title issued to a lienholder who has a perfected security interest. Provides that if a recorded lienholder does not reaffirm a lien and does not respond to a request to verify a lien release letter within 7 calendar days of receipt, the Secretary shall process an application for corrected title for the owner of a motor vehicle. Provides that the Secretary may issue a certificate of title to an out-of-state resident if the out-of-state resident is a bona fide purchaser of a vehicle or a manufactured home from a dealer licensed in this State and the licensed dealer is no longer operating as a licensed dealer and does not properly transfer the title application to the bona fide purchaser prior to the licensed dealer's business closure. Adds to the special license plates a person may reclassify without a replacement plate fee beginning with the 2019 (rather than 2018) registration year. Provides that the bond amount required to be deposited with the Secretary for each applicant who intends to act as a remittance agent shall be $20,000 (rather than $10,000). Provides that an application for a new vehicle dealer's license or a used vehicle dealer's license shall contain a bond or certificate of deposit in the amount of $50,000 (rather than $20,000). Creates provisions concerning rental-purchase agreement vehicle programs. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-MISCELLANEOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0450
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2017-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 016-000-000
2017-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2017-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-134.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62551-171.01aAmended CodeCitation Text
62553-107Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-116Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-203Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-802Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-905Amended CodeCitation Text
62555-101Amended CodeCitation Text
62555-102Amended CodeCitation Text
62555-503Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-305Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1556&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1556.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1556eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1556enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0450.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1556sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1556sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1556ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1556_04262017_069000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1556_05182017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1556_05312017_039000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback