IL SB1544 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Makes changes concerning the composition and election of members of the Board of Trustees of the Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN-CHGO TCHR-BD ELECTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-138 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-139 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |