IL SB1539 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill. Adds provision amending the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Provides that any construction, modification, establishment, or change in categories of service of a health care facility funded through an appropriation from the General Assembly and maintained or operated by a State agency is not subject to the requirements of the Act. Provides that a State agency is subject to the Act when that State agency discontinues a health care facility or category of service. Provides that a State agency must notify the Health Facilities and Services Review Board in writing of any appropriation by the General Assembly for the construction, modification, establishment or change in categories of service, excluding discontinuations of a health care facility or categories of service, maintained or operated by the State. Provides further requirements concerning the written notice. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-QUINCY VET HOME

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0035
2021-06-25SenateEffective Date June 25, 2021
2021-06-25SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-05-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-17HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-05-14HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-05-12HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2021-05-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-05HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021
2021-04-13SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
2021-03-17SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to State Government
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305001-35Amended CodeCitation Text
3050020-170New CodeSee Bill Text
3302165Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1539&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1539.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1539eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1539enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0035.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1539ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1539ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1539_04212021_069043.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1539_05272021_026000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1539ham002_05312021_012001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1539ham001_05312021_012000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback