IL SB1538 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality's police department may be discontinued after referendum of the electors of the municipality. Requires a petition of the electors requesting the referendum or an ordinance requesting the referendum by the city council of the municipality. Provides that if the referendum passes, the sheriff's department acquires primary jurisdiction over police protection of the municipality and the county acquires the authority to levy any taxes the municipality could have levied to support the policing of the municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-DISCONTINUE POLICE DEPT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-06SenatePostponed - Local Government
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Local Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-1-14New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback