IL SB1532 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for Illinois licensed wine manufacturers and craft brewers in an amount equal to 50% of the qualified costs incurred by a qualified taxpayer during the taxable year. Prohibits a taxpayer from receiving a credit of more than $1,500. Provides that the tax credit shall be awarded on the basis of costs related to the purchase of crops used in the manufacture of beer or wine that are grown and harvested in Illinois. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-BEER/WINE CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Bennett |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1532&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1532.htm |