IL SB1519 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Deletes a provision that requires Department of Juvenile Justice personnel who are hired by the Department and who participate or assist in the rehabilitative and vocational training of delinquent youths, supervise the daily activities involving direct and continuing responsibility for the youth's security, welfare and development, or participate in the personal rehabilitation of delinquent youth by training, supervising, and assisting lower level personnel who perform these duties to have a bachelor's or advanced degree from an accredited college or university with a specialization in criminal justice, education, psychology, social work, or a closely related social science or other bachelor's or advanced degree with at least 2 years' experience in the field of juvenile matters. Requires those persons to only have any bachelor's or advanced degree from an accredited college or university. Provides that the Department shall, by regular (rather than certified) mail and telephone or electronic message, notify the parent, guardian, or nearest relative of any person committed to the Department of his or her physical location and any change of his or her physical location. Amends the Illinois Pension Code to make conforming changes.
Title
DJJ-PERSONNEL-QUALIFICATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0019 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-10-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |